Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Horta Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹Born
22 Jan 165680.0SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
29 May 165680.4ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
13 Aug 165983.6DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Horta Rodríguez
Bishop Lorenzo Horta Rodríguez (born 1576, died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrión de los Condes, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018