Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan José de Eguiara y Eguren

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1696Born
24 Jan 175255.9AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
6 Jul 175256.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida), México
29 Jan 176366.9DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Juan José de Eguiara y Eguren (VIAF: 49314536)
Father Juan José de Eguiara y Eguren (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast