Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Leandro Gómez de Parada Valdez y Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1678BornGuadalajara
7 Dec 171537.7AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
28 Oct 171638.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
7 Dec 171638.7InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Dec 172850.7SelectedBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
6 Jul 172951.3ConfirmedBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
2 Dec 173557.7AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
14 Jan 175172.8DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Leandro Gómez de Parada Valdez y Mendoza:
Bishop Juan Leandro Gómez de Parada Valdez y Mendoza (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,564
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 216, and Page 421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013