Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Arriaga y Agüero, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648²Born
18 Apr 169648.2SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
20 Nov 169749.8ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
24 Nov 169850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
24 Nov 169850.8DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Arriaga y Agüero
Bishop Antonio de Arriaga y Agüero O.S.A. (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Spain

  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 240, Number 1,487
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,698, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast