Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leandro Rodríguez de la Gala y Enríquez

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1814Born
1837²22.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 186349.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yucatán (Mérida), México
22 Jun 186854.3AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
14 Feb 186954.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
4 Mar 186955.0InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
15 Feb 188772.9DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leandro Rodríguez de la Gala y Enríquez (VIAF: 9582984)
Bishop Leandro Rodríguez de la Gala y Enríquez (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)
Ordained BishopLa Merced, Church, Habana, Diocese of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
Death PlaceMérida, Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 599
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,869, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast