Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rafael Palma Capetillo

Auxiliary Bishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz

Titular Bishop of Vallis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1955 BornMérida
5 Jun 198024.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Yucatán, México
14 Jun 198125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
2 Apr 200448.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México
2 Apr 200448.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
3 Jun 200448.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vallis
28 Apr 201660.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for José Rafael Palma Capetillo
Bishop José Rafael Palma Capetillo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jalapa (Xalapa)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Jalapa (Xalapa).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,604
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2016
  • od/c01: CB, 28 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Apr 2016