Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis García Guillén, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1763Born
19 Oct 183067.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
28 Feb 183167.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
29 Jan 183268.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
19 Aug 183470.9DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Luis García Guillén
Bishop Luis García Guillén O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComitán

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149, and Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast