Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fermín José Fuero y Gómez Martinez Arañon

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1749Born
18 Dec 179546.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
11 Sep 179647.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 Jul 180051.0DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Fermín José Fuero y Gómez Martinez Arañon
Bishop Fermín José Fuero y Gómez Martinez Arañon (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCañizares, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,641
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 114, Number 599
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast