Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vidal de Moctezuma y Tobar, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1700³Born
172019.4ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
25 Mar 175352.6SelectedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
28 May 175352.8ConfirmedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
2 Jun 175453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
3 Oct 176666.1DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Vidal de Moctezuma y Tobar
Bishop José Vidal de Moctezuma y Tobar O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis Potosi

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast