Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximino Ruiz y Flores

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

Titular Bishop of Derbe

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1875BornAtlacomulco
1901²25.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 191337.8AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Sep 191338.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
24 Oct 191338.1InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Mar 192044.5ResignedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Mar 192044.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
8 Mar 192044.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
11 May 194973.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximino Ruiz y Flores:
Bishop Maximino Ruiz y Flores (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015