Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gabriel de Olivares y Benito

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1727Born
15 Sep 178861.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
19 Apr 178962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
22 Sep 179568.4AppointedBishop of Durango, México
26 May 179669.1InstalledBishop of Durango, México
26 Feb 181284.8DiedBishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gabriel de Olivares y Benito
Bishop Francisco Gabriel de Olivares y Benito (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAjalvir, Spain

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 106, Number 551
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163, and Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast