Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Mariano Luque y Ayerdi

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1838Born
21 Sep 186526.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
23 Sep 186526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
13 Nov 188445.9AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
27 Dec 188446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 May 190162.4DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Mariano Luque y Ayerdi
Bishop Miguel Mariano Luque y Ayerdi (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacapoaxtla
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,884, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 707

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast