Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Pérez Lazarraga y Maneli Viana, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599²BornMadrid, Spain
3 Oct 163940.7AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
2 Jan 1640³41.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Oct 164041.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
18 Feb 164950.1DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Pérez Lazarraga y Maneli Viana:
Bishop Cristóbal Pérez Lazarraga y Maneli Viana O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,413
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 148
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 168, Number 1,053

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015