Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Cilieza y Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1708BornSan Luis Potosi
22 Apr 176557.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
22 Apr 176557.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
24 Jun 176557.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
27 Apr 176759.3AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
23 Dec 176760.0InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
7 Apr 176860.3DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Cilieza y Velasco:
Bishop Miguel Cilieza y Velasco (died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 451
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,388
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013