Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Manuel López Alfaro

Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México

Titular Bishop of Garba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1963 Born
29 Sep 199027.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Toluca, México, México
15 Aug 199128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
2004²40.5IncardinatedPriest of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
6 Jun 202056.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
6 Jun 202056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Garba
28 Aug 202057.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Manuel López Alfaro
Bishop Luis Manuel López Alfaro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopMaría Auxiliadora, Church, San Cristóbal de las Casas, Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2020
  • opd/od/ob: CB, 6 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Aug 2020

Quantcast