Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Zapata y Sandoval, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545²BornMéxico
13 Nov 161368.8AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
23 Nov 161368.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
13 Sep 162176.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
9 Jan 163085.0DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Zapata y Sandoval:
Bishop Juan de Zapata y Sandoval O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148, and Page 199
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015