Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Orozco y Jiménez

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1864BornZamora
17 Dec 188723.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 190237.5AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
15 Aug 190237.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
3 Dec 190238.0InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
2 Dec 191248.0AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
9 Feb 191348.2InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Feb 193671.3DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Orozco y Jiménez:
Archbishop Francisco Orozco y Jiménez (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,399
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013