Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Alvarez de Toledo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1655BornSan Salvador, El Salvador
24 Sep 170853.3AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
15 Dec 170853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
17 Jan 171458.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
30 Aug 172368.2AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
1 Jul 172570.0DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Alvarez de Toledo:
Bishop Juan Bautista Alvarez de Toledo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,643
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157, and Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015