Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Llano

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1748Born
1775¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 180153.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
12 Sep 180253.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 Jul 181566.6DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Llano
Bishop Ambrosio Llano (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRueda

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 55
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 645

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast