Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Tomás de Blanes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1609AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
22 Mar 1609Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
5 Feb 1612DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Juan Tomás de Blanes
Bishop Juan Tomás de Blanes O.P. (died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,835
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 125, Number 801
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,609, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast