Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de las Casas (Casaus), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1474BornSevilla, Spain
151035.1Ordained PriestPriest
152348.1IncardinatedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Dec 154369.1AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
30 Mar 154469.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
11 Sep 155075.8ResignedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
31 Jul 156691.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de las Casas (Casaus):
Bishop Bartolomé de las Casas (Casaus) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,371
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013