Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Casillas, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1529ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Jan 1551AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
1552²Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
29 Oct 1567DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Casillas:
Bishop Tomás Casillas O.P. (died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013