Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nègre

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres)

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1853BornSaint-Bonnet-de-Chirac
1879¹25.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 191663.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Viviers, France
7 Dec 191663.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
11 Feb 191763.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
21 May 192369.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Viviers, France
14 Jun 192470.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
5 Feb 192571.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
7 Feb 194086.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Nègre:
Bishop Paul Nègre (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013