Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André-Etienne-Antoine de Morlhon

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1753Born
12 Feb 182369.3SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
16 May 182369.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
13 Jul 182369.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch, France
14 Jan 182874.2DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for André-Etienne-Antoine de Morlhon
Archbishop André-Etienne-Antoine de Morlhon (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillefranche-de-Panat

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018