Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amédée-Jean-Baptiste Latieule

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1838BornSaint-Mayme
21 May 186425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rodez (-Vabres), France
22 Mar 189859.7SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
24 Mar 189859.7ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
29 Jun 189860.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
21 Oct 190365.3DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Amédée-Jean-Baptiste Latieule:
Bishop Amédée-Jean-Baptiste Latieule (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013