Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Corneillan

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1548AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
27 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
30 Aug 1582DiedBishop of Rodez, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Corneillan:
Bishop Jacques Corneillan (died ) Bishop of Rodez

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 288, and Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013