Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornTours
23 Apr 166655.3SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
7 Feb 166756.0ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
8 May 166756.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
11 Oct 168271.7DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson:
Bishop Gabriel de Voyer de Paulmy d’Argenson (died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015