Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bellino Giusto Ghirard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1935Born
30 Jun 196227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Agen, France
25 Apr 199054.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
17 Jun 199055.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
1 Jun 199156.0SucceededBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
2 Apr 201175.8RetiredBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
26 Jul 201378.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Bellino Giusto Ghirard
Bishop Bellino Giusto Ghirard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rodez (-Vabres)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeyches

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,882
  • d: CB, 26 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,831
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast