Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie-André Ginisty

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1864BornLaroque-Valzergues
21 Sep 188925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rodez (-Vabres), France
11 Mar 191449.8AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
17 May 191450.0Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
11 Jun 191450.1InstalledBishop of Verdun, France
7 Jan 194681.7DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-André Ginisty:
Bishop Charles-Marie-André Ginisty (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013