Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-André-Toussaint-Bruno de Ramond-Lalande

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1761BornMontauban
2 Jun 178725.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181755.9SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
1 Oct 181755.9ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
13 Apr 182361.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
9 Jan 183068.2SelectedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
10 Apr 183068.4DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Charles-André-Toussaint-Bruno de Ramond-Lalande:
Bishop Charles-André-Toussaint-Bruno de Ramond-Lalande (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 328, and Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013