Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Eugène-Auguste-Charles Foulquier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Corydala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1866Born
7 Jul 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Aug 190639.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
18 Aug 190639.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corydala
21 Nov 190639.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corydala
27 Jun 192962.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
31 Dec 194882.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Marie-Eugène-Auguste-Charles Foulquier
Bishop Marie-Eugène-Auguste-Charles Foulquier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuc, France

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast