Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Vernède-Corneillan

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹BornOrlonhac
12 Oct 158030.8AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
6 Feb 158333.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
13 Sep 161464.7DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Vernède-Corneillan:
Bishop François Vernède-Corneillan (died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a bishop for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 299
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013