Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine-Marie Foulquier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1798BornLafon
22 Dec 182123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rodez, France
17 Jan 184950.9SelectedBishop of Mende, France
2 Apr 184951.2ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
2 Sep 184951.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
1 Mar 187375.1RetiredBishop of Mende, France
20 Feb 188284.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine-Marie Foulquier:
Bishop Jean-Antoine-Marie Foulquier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013