Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raymond Cardinal (Vehens) de Mostuéjouls, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1317AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
31 Jul 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
16 Apr 1319AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 1335DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond (Vehens) de Mostuéjouls:
Cardinal Raymond (Vehens) de Mostuéjouls O.S.B. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
  • a cardinal for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013