Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Bruguière (Brughiero), C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1851Born
187220.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
26 May 187725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Jul 189139.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
29 Jul 189139.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
13 Dec 189140.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
19 Oct 190655.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China

MicroData Summary for Jules Bruguière (Brughiero)
Bishop Jules Bruguière (Brughiero) C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNant, Diocese of Rodez, France
Ordained BishopTchengtingfou
Death PlaceShanghai

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,891, Number 52
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast