Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulin-Joseph-Justin Albouy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nanning [Nanning], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1880Born
21 Jun 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Mar 193049.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanning [Nanning], China
27 Mar 193049.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
24 Aug 193050.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidyessus
11 Apr 194665.8AppointedArchbishop of Nanning [Nanning], China
6 Feb 195473.6DiedArchbishop of Nanning [Nanning], China

MicroData Summary for Paulin-Joseph-Justin Albouy
Archbishop Paulin-Joseph-Justin Albouy M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Nanning [Nanning]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Tavernes, France

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast