Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Ramond, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hung Hoá

Titular Bishop of Linoë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1855BornMontlaur, France
4 Jul 188025.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Apr 189540.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Tonking {Tonkino Superiore}, Viet Nam
18 Apr 189540.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Linoë
15 Oct 189540.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Linoë
21 May 193883.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Hung Hoá, Viet Nam
5 Jan 194488.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hung Hoá, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Ramond:
Bishop Paul-Marie Ramond M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Hung Hoá

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013