Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacifico Tiziano Micheloni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1881Born
1903²21.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Apr 193352.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
25 Apr 193352.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
8 Sep 193352.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
6 Jul 193655.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Tiziano Micheloni
Bishop Pacifico Tiziano Micheloni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Arabia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast