Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriele Vettori

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1869Born
24 Jul 189222.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 191040.3AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 Jun 191040.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
4 Dec 191040.9InstalledBishop of Tivoli, Italy
6 Dec 191545.9AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
25 Jul 191646.6InstalledBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
6 Feb 193262.1AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
2 Jul 194777.5DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Vettori
Archbishop Gabriele Vettori (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFibbiana

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast