Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Pierallini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1817BornPrato
4 Apr 184022.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187154.6AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
1872¹54.6Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
29 Sep 187659.4AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
188870.6DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pierallini:
Archbishop Giovanni Pierallini (born ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013