Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo José González Rubio

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Popayán

Titular Bishop of Lambaesis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1778BornCartagena, Colombia
1801¹22.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183657.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
30 Aug 183960.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Popayán, Colombia
1 Mar 184061.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
15 Jun 184566.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo José González Rubio:
Bishop Mateo José González Rubio (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Popayán

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 229
  • ab/d: CB, 28 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013