Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gori

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1885Born
13 Jun 190823.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 194358.2AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
3 Oct 194358.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
2 Jul 196984.1DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gori
Bishop Giuseppe Gori (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast