Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gherardo Gherardi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1628Born
15 Apr 165627.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 167950.7AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
16 Apr 167950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
16 Jan 169061.4DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gherardo Gherardi
Bishop Gherardo Gherardi (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast