Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Pucci

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1458BornFlorence
15 Feb 150950.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pistoia, Italy
12 Aug 151355.0AppointedAdministrator of Melfi, Italy
23 Sep 151355.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Sep 151355.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
21 Nov 151355.3AppointedAdministrator of Vannes, France
13 Dec 151355.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pistoia, Italy
151455.4ResignedAdministrator of Vannes, France
151657.4AppointedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
1 Apr 151758.6AppointedAdministrator of Giovinazzo, Italy
Aug 1517³59.0ResignedAdministrator of Giovinazzo, Italy
17 Sep 151860.1SucceededBishop of Pistoia, Italy
5 Nov 151860.2ResignedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
151960.4ResignedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
23 Mar 151960.6AppointedAdministrator of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
13 Apr 151960.7ResignedAdministrator of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
10 Sep 152264.1AppointedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy
12 Jun 152364.8ResignedAdministrator of Capaccio, Italy
15 Jun 152465.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Jul 152465.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 Mar 152869.6ResignedAdministrator of Melfi, Italy
16 Sep 153173.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Pucci:
Cardinal Lorenzo Pucci (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 216, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 241, and Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013