Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ugo Giubbi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1886Born
6 Sep 190822.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 192842.4AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
24 Aug 192842.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
23 Sep 194660.6DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ugo Giubbi
Bishop Ugo Giubbi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePracchia

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,947
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast