Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lattanzio Lattanzi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1575AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
19 Feb 1576Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
11 Dec 1587DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lattanzio Lattanzi (VIAF: 304914741)
Bishop Lattanzio Lattanzi (died ) Bishop of Pistoia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ravenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast