Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Toli

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1761BornLivorno
7 Mar 178423.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 179534.5AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
27 Sep 179534.6Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
28 Mar 180342.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
6 Jul 183372.3DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Toli:
Bishop Francesco Toli (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013