Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Falchi Picchinesi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1734BornVolterra
24 Sep 176834.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 179157.3AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
21 Dec 179157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
10 Feb 180368.4DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Falchi Picchinesi
Bishop Francesco Falchi Picchinesi (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016