Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angiolo Maria Gilardoni

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1759BornFirenze
21 Dec 178223.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 182161.7AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
15 Aug 182161.7Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
23 Jun 183474.6AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
24 May 183575.5DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angiolo Maria Gilardoni:
Bishop Angiolo Maria Gilardoni (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 238, and Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013