Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Antinori

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531²Born
2 Aug 156837.5AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
15 Jan 157443.0AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
2 Dec 157544.9AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
13 Feb 157645.1DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Antinori (VIAF: 4564149844955802960000)
Archbishop Ludovico Antinori (born 1531, died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,924
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast